skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:52:24 AM

Steadman, Jennifer Hawys

CPSO#: 25417

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 658 Gorham Street Newmarket ON L3Y 1L4
Date Received: 19 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 2015