skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:58:52 PM

Persaud, Baneshwar

CPSO#: 25374

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital 327 Reynolds Street Oakville, ON L6J 3L7
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014