skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 11:44:40 PM

Koleszar, Nicholas

CPSO#: 25356

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013