skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:34:30 PM

Grieve, William Norman

CPSO#: 25332

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients can send an email to grieve2@rogers.com or they can write a letter to 316 Glenbrook Drive, Midland, ON, L4R 5G4
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011