skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:30:54 PM

Balfour, John Edward

CPSO#: 25308

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1984