skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 5:22:38 PM

Haroun, Gamal Wanis

CPSO#: 25249

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Sep 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 225
2130 North Park Dr.
Bramalea ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 789-5627
Fax: 905 789 5699 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5425 Creditview Rd.
Unit # 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Canada
Phone: 905 286 9155
Fax: 905 286 9153
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

5425 Creditview Rd.
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Canada
Phone: 905 286 9155
Fax: 905 286 9153
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Jun 2019 Active
             As from June 6, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gamal Wanis Haroun,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haroun to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. GAMAL HAROUN
                                           ("Dr. Haroun")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Haroun, certificate of registration number 25249, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215244 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my diagnostic
                  radiology practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Haroun, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Haroun, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the PROBE: Ethics and Boundaries Program
                        Canada, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any
                        condition or qualification.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Haroun, undertake to abide by any recommendations of the
                        PROBE program;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Haroun, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Haroun, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Haroun
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Haroun will engage in professional education in
                                    professional ethics.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Haroun, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until
                  the College determines its terms are satisfied.

            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Haroun, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Haroun, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Haroun, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or 

                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gamal Wanis Haroun to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 6, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Haroun engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Haroun will engage in professional education in professional ethics.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)