skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:54:36 PM

Nicholson, Wendy May

CPSO#: 25246

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007