skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:48:23 AM

Massiah, Karl Alleyne

CPSO#: 25229

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2015