skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:54:06 PM

Muggah, Henry Forman

CPSO#: 25224

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2018