skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:31:55 AM

Fisher, Michael Gailey

CPSO#: 25204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010