skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 1:28:37 AM

Ladipo, Gani Olaniyi Aremu

CPSO#: 25200

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Glasgow, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010