skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:55:07 PM

Chiu, Hak Ming

CPSO#: 25192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Record Department Lakeridge Health Oshawa 1 Hospital Court Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016