skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:34:55 PM

Bustard, Brian Reginald

CPSO#: 25089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Aug 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2040 Sheppard Ave
(2nd Floor)
North York ON  M2J 5B3
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Bustard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bustard ( CPSO# 25089 )

Business Address:
265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 5C7
Phone Number: (416) 640-2229

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN REGINALD BUSTARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSTARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1972