skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:33:13 PM

Naqvi, Salim Ziauddin

CPSO#: 25021

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Feb 1901
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1972