skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:32:11 PM

Shum, Keeson Patrick

CPSO#: 24987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: None Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2007