skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:55:28 PM

Dunphy, John William Edmund

CPSO#: 24986

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Mar-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Dublin, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1998