skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:25:48 AM

Harhara, Feisal Bin Abdullah

CPSO#: 24925

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003