skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:27:14 PM

Pelka, Jaroslav

CPSO#: 24921

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Slovak

Education:University of Palacky, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001