skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:37:54 PM

Olah, Michael

CPSO#: 24900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak, Ukrainian

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 Beamish Drive
Islington ON  M9B 3P3
Phone: (416) 239-2305
Fax: (416) 239-2306 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL OLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1972