skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:55:20 AM

Van Rhijn, Peter Rembrandt

CPSO#: 24886

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:State University of Leiden, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Van Rhijn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014