skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:09:21 AM

Rose, Donald Keith

CPSO#: 24799

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013