skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:20:29 AM

Stogre, Rosemary Ann

CPSO#: 24657

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1971 to 14 Jun 1972
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2014