skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:08:36 AM

Gladman, Dafna Debora

CPSO#: 24647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
1E 410B
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5753
Fax: (416) 603-9387 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dafna Gladman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gladman ( CPSO# 24647 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
1E 410B
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5753

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAFNA DEBORA GLADMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1972