skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 2:06:19 PM

Tiegs, Richard George

CPSO#: 24608

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jan 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
44 Kelly Dr.
Kitchener ON  N2M 1V6
Phone: (519) 578-0201 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Tiegs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tiegs ( CPSO# 24608 )

Business Address:
44 Kelly Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 1V6
Phone Number: (519) 578-0201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 Jan 2014 Active
 

            As from January 27, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard George Tiegs,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiegs to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Tiegs may practise solely as a surgical assistant under the direction
                  of a surgeon approved by the College, and may not act as Most Responsible
                  Physician for any patient.