skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:16:36 PM

Leach, Alan James

CPSO#: 24596

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thursday Cardiology Referal Clinic Patients: Ottawa Heart Institute 40 Ruskin St Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7 T: 613-696-7313 F: 613-696-7139 All other patients: FileBank 200 - 488 Carlingview Dr Toronto ON M9W 6M8 T: 416-798-1404 F: 416-798-1639
Date Received: 04 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2019