skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 11:33:35 PM

Semchyshyn, Stefan

CPSO#: 24588

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2003