skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:17:16 AM

Argument, William Frederick George

CPSO#: 24584

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 100 1220 Place D'Orleans Drive Orleans ON K1C 7K3
Date Received: 14 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017