skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:16:28 AM

Rowan, James Peter

CPSO#: 24577

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MedCan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES PETER ROWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972