skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:29:22 AM

Chiavaro, Hector Luis

CPSO#: 24554

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017