skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:16:57 AM

Watts, John Michael

CPSO#: 24462

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015