skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:57:43 PM

Bergman, June Sandra

CPSO#: 24349

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jul 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 1985