skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 8:22:08 AM

Chang, Sze Ching

CPSO#: 24274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Street
Kitchener ON  N2N 1J9
Phone: (519) 749-6793 Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SZE CHING CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1971