skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 6:44:12 PM

Johnston, James Donald

CPSO#: 24250

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: None Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003