skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:27:10 AM

Ngan, Chun

CPSO#: 24240

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Fukien, Indonesian, Mandarin, Spanish

Education:Shanghai First Medical College, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 05 Oct 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 14, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 14, 2010, Dr. Chun Ngan has undertaken to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to cease to practice medicine in all jurisdictions.