skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:04:49 PM

Kealy, Ciaran Liam Thomas

CPSO#: 24239

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 14 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ciaran Kealy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2019