skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:18:39 PM

Simmons, Michael Elliot

CPSO#: 24217

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Mar 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RRSR Inc 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 07 Mar 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Elliot Simmons to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 8, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Simmons engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Simmons resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)