skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:55:43 PM

Ashby, Peter

CPSO#: 23999

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
EMG Laboratory
4 Fell Pavillion
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5922 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER ASHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1971