skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:10:11 PM

Rossman, Richard Lawrence

CPSO#: 23995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 525-2779
Fax: (905) 525-1723 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Rossman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rossman ( CPSO# 23995 )

Business Address:
1 Young Street
Suite 311
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 525-2779

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD LAWRENCE ROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1971