skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 5:12:58 AM

Greenberg, Mark Lawrence

CPSO#: 23994

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1014-480 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019