skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:42:40 AM

Meltzer, Alan Sydney

CPSO#: 23892

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Mar-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998