skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:23:39 AM

Kronick, Stanley Harris

CPSO#: 23842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley Kronick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Apple Tree Clinic 225 Preston St Ottawa ON K1R 7R1 613-288-0279
Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their record should contact the address or phone number above.
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019