skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 8:09:25 AM

Melville, John Malcolm

CPSO#: 23840

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002