skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 5:16:54 AM

Huda, Sayyid Shamsul

CPSO#: 23821

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2011