skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 8:30:02 PM

Liem, Tiang-Ham

CPSO#: 23721

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German, Indonesian

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tiang-Ham Liem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liem ( CPSO# 23721 )

Business Address:
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
Unit D
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (519) 258-4356

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIANG-HAM LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971