skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:08:32 AM

Hardacre, Gordon Douglas

CPSO#: 23693

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2007