skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:56:05 AM

Winning, John Barry

CPSO#: 23673

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Winning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Medical Imaging Suite 309 328 Highway 7 East Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P7
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016