skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:47:11 AM

Sasseville, Francoise

CPSO#: 23605

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Sasseville-Brisson, Francoise (used until: 27 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008