skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:38:57 AM

Blair, Donald Cameron

CPSO#: 23496

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.C. Blair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013