skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:42:21 AM

Sanchez, Adolfo

CPSO#: 23287

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Valladolid, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Call toll free at: 1-800-775-0093 or visit www.recordsregistry.ca for paitent medical charts
Date Received: 28 Aug 2018


Address: Records Management Ltd 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 13 Aug 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2018