skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 6:39:46 PM

Prevost, Yves

CPSO#: 23258

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Aug-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 13 May 1955 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1986